Case Last Refreshed: 1 month ago
Auto Club Insurance Company Of Fl, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Odalyse Nodarse-Buscemi, Esq, against Stowell, Linda, Stowell, Thomas, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with NEWTON, CYNTHIA J presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeNEWTON, CYNTHIA J Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 30, 2016 |
CategoryAuto Negligence - Circuit |
Last RefreshedMarch 13, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED NOT ISSUED NEED $10.00 SUMMONS FEE
Date: December 30, 2016SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED ISSUED Party: STOWELL, THOMAS
Date: December 30, 2016CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: December 30, 2016COMPLAINT
Date: December 30, 2016SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED ISSUED 1/6/17 Party: STOWELL, LINDA
Date: January 04, 2017SUMMONS - NOT SERVED Party: STOWELL, THOMAS
Date: February 06, 2017SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED Party: STOWELL, LINDA
Date: February 09, 2017REQUEST SUMMONS ON AMENDED COMPLAINT ISSUED 2/21/2017 FOR THOMAS STOWELL
Date: February 21, 2017REQUEST SUMMONS ON AMENDED COMPLAINT ISSUED 2/21/2017 FOR LINDA STOWELL
Date: February 21, 2017AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: February 21, 2017SUMMONS - NOT SERVED Party: STOWELL, THOMAS
Date: February 24, 2017NOTICE OF FILING RETURN RECEIPT
Date: March 31, 2017NOTICE OF FILING ACCEPTANCE OF SECRETARY OF STATE SERVICE
Date: March 31, 2017AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE
Date: March 31, 2017AFFIDAVIT OF COMPLIANCE WITH DILIGENT SEARCH
Date: March 31, 2017NOTICE OF FILING SECOND RETURN RECEIPT
Date: August 14, 2017AFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH AND INQUIRY Party: STOWELL, LINDA
Date: August 14, 2017MOTION FOR DEFAULT NO DEFAULT FORM
Date: August 14, 2017DEFAULT ENTERED BY COURT Doc # 1 Party: STOWELL, LINDA Party: STOWELL, THOMAS
Date: September 18, 2017AFFIDAVIT OF INTEREST Doc # 3
Date: December 26, 2017AFFIDAVIT AS TO COSTS Doc # 2 BY PLTF
Date: December 26, 2017FINAL JUDGMENT Doc # 4 (DEFAULT) Vol./Book 19900, Page 2072, 1 pages
Date: January 04, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
CC JUDGMENT MADE-HANDED RECORDING Doc # 6
Judge: NEWTON, CYNTHIA J |
|
January 04, 2018 | Docket Event |
FINAL JUDGMENT Doc # 4 (DEFAULT) Vol./Book 19900, Page 2072, 1 pages
Judge: NEWTON, CYNTHIA J |
|
January 04, 2018 | Docket Event |
DEFAULT JUDGMENT (SRS DISPO) Doc # 5
Judge: NEWTON, CYNTHIA J |
|
December 26, 2017 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OF INTEREST Doc # 3
Judge: NEWTON, CYNTHIA J |
|
December 26, 2017 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT AS TO COSTS Doc # 2 BY PLTF
Judge: NEWTON, CYNTHIA J |
|
September 18, 2017 | Docket Event |
DEFAULT ENTERED BY COURT Doc # 1 Party: STOWELL, LINDA Party: STOWELL, THOMAS
Judge: NEWTON, CYNTHIA J |
|
August 14, 2017 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF FILING SECOND RETURN RECEIPT
Judge: NEWTON, CYNTHIA J |
|
August 14, 2017 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH AND INQUIRY Party: STOWELL, LINDA
Judge: NEWTON, CYNTHIA J |
|
August 14, 2017 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR DEFAULT NO DEFAULT FORM
Judge: NEWTON, CYNTHIA J |
|
August 14, 2017 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF FILING SECOND RETURN RECEIPT
Judge: NEWTON, CYNTHIA J |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.