Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Doumanian, George, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case represented by Andrew D Reeder, Esq, against Safeco Insurance Company Of Illinois, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with HESSINGER, KATHLEEN presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHESSINGER, KATHLEEN Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 29, 2016 |
CategorySmall Claims Pip 3 - $501 - $2,500 |
Last RefreshedSeptember 08, 2023 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
This complaint is filed by George Doumanian against Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois. The plaintiff is seeking damages not exceeding $5,000, specifically $1,584.96 for services provided at Mayer Chiropractic between January 27, 2016, and Septembe...
STATEMENT OF CLAIM
Date: December 29, 2016COMPLAINT
Date: December 29, 2016REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS
Date: December 29, 2016NOTICE-STMT OF CLAIM-DEFT Party: SAFECO INSURANCE COMPANY OF ILLINOIS
Date: January 03, 2017NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES
Date: December 29, 2016NOTICE-SERVICE-PROCESS INS COMM SAFECO INSURANCE COMPANJ OF ILLINOIS
Date: January 06, 2017(NON RECORDED) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL W/ PREJUDICE
Date: January 23, 2017SUMMONS-NOTICE EMAILED TO ATTY-PLTF FOR SERVICE Party: SAFECO INSURANCE COMPANY OF ILLINOIS
Date: January 03, 2017NOTICE-SERVICE-PROCESS INS COMM SAFECO INSURANCE COMPANY OF ILLINOIS
Date: January 06, 2017NOTICE TO PLTF-PLTF ATTY
Date: January 03, 2017REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION
Date: December 29, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 26, 2017 | Docket Event |
CANCELED SMALL CLAIMS PRE-TRIAL (11:30 AM) (Judicial Officer HESSINGER, KATHLEEN T) CASE DISMISSED
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
|
January 23, 2017 | Docket Event |
(NON RECORDED) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL W/ PREJUDICE
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
|
January 23, 2017 | Docket Event |
CASE DISMISSED - BEFORE HEARING (SRS DISPOSITION)
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
|
January 06, 2017 | Docket Event |
NOTICE-SERVICE-PROCESS INS COMM SAFECO INSURANCE COMPANJ OF ILLINOIS
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
|
January 06, 2017 | Docket Event |
NOTICE-SERVICE-PROCESS INS COMM SAFECO INSURANCE COMPANY OF ILLINOIS
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
|
January 03, 2017 | Docket Event |
NOTICE-STMT OF CLAIM-DEFT Party: SAFECO INSURANCE COMPANY OF ILLINOIS
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
|
January 03, 2017 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS-NOTICE EMAILED TO ATTY-PLTF FOR SERVICE Party: SAFECO INSURANCE COMPANY OF ILLINOIS
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
|
January 03, 2017 | Docket Event |
NOTICE TO PLTF-PLTF ATTY
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
|
December 29, 2016 | Docket Event |
STATEMENT OF CLAIM
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
|
December 29, 2016 | Docket Event |
COMPLAINT
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.