Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Joseph Aprile Dc Pl, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case represented by Andrew D Reeder, Esq, against Progressive Select Insurance Company, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with KELLY, LORRAINE presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKELLY, LORRAINE Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 29, 2016 |
CategorySmall Claims Pip 2 - $100 - $500 |
Last RefreshedSeptember 08, 2023 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION
Date: December 29, 2016NOTICE-SERVICE-PROCESS INS COMM 010517 PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY
Date: January 05, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 19, 2017 | Docket Event |
CANCELED SMALL CLAIMS PRE-TRIAL (11:30 AM) (Judicial Officer KELLY, LORRAINE) CASE DISMISSED
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
|
January 09, 2017 | Docket Event |
(NON RECORDED) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
|
January 09, 2017 | Docket Event |
CASE DISMISSED - BEFORE HEARING (SRS DISPOSITION)
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
|
January 05, 2017 | Docket Event |
NOTICE-SERVICE-PROCESS INS COMM 010517 PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
|
January 05, 2017 | Docket Event |
NOTICE-SERVICE-PROCESS INS COMM PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
|
December 30, 2016 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS-NOTICE EMAILED TO ATTY-PLTF FOR SERVICE Party: JOSEPH APRILE DC PL Party: PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
|
December 30, 2016 | Docket Event |
NOTICE-STMT OF CLAIM-DEFT Party: PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
|
December 30, 2016 | Docket Event |
NOTICE TO PLTF-PLTF ATTY
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
|
December 29, 2016 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
|
December 29, 2016 | Docket Event |
COMPLAINT
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.