Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Back On Track Llc, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case represented by Andrew D Reeder, Esq, against Geico General Insurance Company, represented by Melanie Smith, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with KELLY, LORRAINE presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKELLY, LORRAINE Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 29, 2016 |
CategorySmall Claims Pip 2 - $100 - $500 |
Last RefreshedSeptember 08, 2023 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
NOTICE-SERVICE-PROCESS INS COMM GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Date: January 06, 2017RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS
Date: February 14, 2017NOTICE OF APPEARANCE /DISCLOSURE AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS
Date: January 09, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 11, 2017 | Docket Event |
(NON RECORDED) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL W/OUT PREJUDICE
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
|
April 11, 2017 | Docket Event |
CASE DISMISSED - AFTER HEARING (SRS DISPOSITION)
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
|
April 07, 2017 | Docket Event |
RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
|
April 04, 2017 | Docket Event |
PLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR CONTEMPT AND SANCTIONS
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
|
April 04, 2017 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT A-COPY CORRESPONDENCE RE:DISCOVERY
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
|
February 24, 2017 | Docket Event |
ATTORNEY COVER LETTER
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
|
February 24, 2017 | Docket Event |
ORDER GRANTING MTN FOR ENLARGMENT OF TIME TO RESPOND/30 DAYS
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
|
February 15, 2017 | Docket Event |
REPLY AND MOTION TO STRIKE DEFENDANT'S AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES AND/OR MOTION FOR MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
|
February 15, 2017 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FILED BY TO RESPOND TO DISCOVERY AND OBJECTIONS Party: GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
|
February 14, 2017 | Docket Event |
RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.