Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Wollek, Roger, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case against Draper, Lisa Marie, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with KELLY, LORRAINE presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKELLY, LORRAINE Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 29, 2016 |
CategorySmall Claims 2 - $100 - $500 |
Last RefreshedOctober 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 05, 2017 | Docket Event |
MASTER ORDER OF DISMISSAL Doc # 1 DRAPER, LISA MARIE Vol./Book 19798, Page 839, 5 pages
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
|
October 05, 2017 | Docket Event |
CASE DISMISSED - BEFORE HEARING (SRS DISPOSITION) Doc # 2
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
|
September 26, 2017 | Docket Event |
DISMISSAL-FAILURE TO PROSECUTE-SC (12:00 AM) (Judicial Officer KELLY, LORRAINE)
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
|
August 25, 2017 | Docket Event |
NOTICE-LACK OF PROSECUTION MAILED TO ALL PARTIES
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
|
January 24, 2017 | Docket Event |
NOTICE TO APPEAR - NOT SERVED Party: DRAPER, LISA MARIE
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
|
January 19, 2017 | Docket Event |
SMALL CLAIMS PRE TRIAL ICD (3:00 PM) (Judicial Officer KELLY, LORRAINE) Result: SC HEARING HELD
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
|
January 19, 2017 | Docket Event |
ORDER AMENDING DEFENDANT INSTANTER Vol./Book 19495, Page 1112, 1 pages
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
|
January 19, 2017 | Docket Event |
PRE-TRIAL CONTINUED PEND SERVICE
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
|
December 30, 2016 | Docket Event |
NOTICE TO PLTF-PLTF ATTY
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
|
December 30, 2016 | Docket Event |
NOTICE-STMT OF CLAIM-DEFT MAILED TO PLAINTIFF Party: DRAPER, LISA MARIE
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.