Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Icon Equities Llc, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Desiree M Lavin, against Robinson, Patricia Y, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with JAGGER, EDWIN presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJAGGER, EDWIN Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 29, 2016 |
CategoryContracts And Indebtedness - County |
Last RefreshedSeptember 08, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED
Date: December 29, 2016REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS BY PLTF
Date: March 10, 2017AFFIDAVIT-SERVICE OF PROCESS 021817 Party: ROBINSON, PATRICIA Y
Date: February 22, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 30, 2017 | Docket Event |
(NON RECORDED) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Doc # 7 W/O PREJUDICE BY Party: ICON EQUITIES LLC
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
November 30, 2017 | Docket Event |
CASE DISMISSED - AFTER HEARING (SRS DISPOSITION) Doc # 6
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
November 22, 2017 | Docket Event |
SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY AS TO Doc # 5 PATRICIA YORKE ROBINSON / 17-BK-09845
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
October 12, 2017 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION Doc # 4
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
October 12, 2017 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SERVICE ANSWERS INTERROGATORIES Doc # 3
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
September 26, 2017 | Docket Event |
ORDER GRANTING Doc # 2 PLTF MOTN TO COMPEL DISCOVERY RESPONSES Vol./Book 19787, Page 1380, 1 pages
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
September 25, 2017 | Docket Event |
PLTF-PET'S MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY Doc # 1 RESPONSES
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
March 10, 2017 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS BY PLTF
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
March 10, 2017 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES BY PLTF
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
March 10, 2017 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION BY PLTF
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.