Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Village Green Park Ltd A Florida Limited Parnership, filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case represented by Keith A Ringelspaugh, Esq, against Garnett, Irene, Garnett, Richard, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with JAGGER, EDWIN presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJAGGER, EDWIN Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 29, 2016 |
CategoryDelinquent Tenant - County |
Last RefreshedNovember 04, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
COMPLAINT
Date: December 29, 2016CERTIFICATE OF MAILING Party: GARNETT, IRENE Party: GARNETT, RICHARD
Date: January 04, 2017DEFAULT ENTERED Party: GARNETT, IRENE Party: GARNETT, RICHARD
Date: January 17, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 22, 2017 | Docket Event |
WRIT OF POSSESSION EXECUTED
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
January 30, 2017 | Docket Event |
FINAL DISPOSITION FORM
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
January 30, 2017 | Docket Event |
WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED TO ATTY
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
January 18, 2017 | Docket Event |
FINAL JUDGMENT- COUNT 1 POSSESSION Vol./Book 19489, Page 1416, 2 pages
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
January 18, 2017 | Docket Event |
ATTORNEY COVER LETTER
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
January 18, 2017 | Docket Event |
DEFAULT JUDGMENT (SRS DISPO)
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
January 17, 2017 | Docket Event |
DEFAULT ENTERED Party: GARNETT, IRENE Party: GARNETT, RICHARD
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
January 17, 2017 | Docket Event |
PLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
January 17, 2017 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR JUDGMENT BY PLTF
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
January 13, 2017 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.