Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Jefferson Capital Systems Llc, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Brooke E Teal, against Soriano, Augustus S, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with CARASSAS, JOHN presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCARASSAS, JOHN Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 29, 2016 |
CategoryContracts And Indebtedness - County |
Last RefreshedSeptember 08, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
This complaint is a legal case filed by Jefferson Capital Systems, LLC against Augustus S Soriano in the County Court of the Sixth Judicial Circuit in Pinellas County, Florida. The plaintiff is seeking damages for breach of contract and unjust enrich...
ATTACHMENT TO COMPLAINT ACCOUNT ACTIVITY
Date: December 29, 2016ATTACHMENT TO COMPLAINT LOAN
Date: December 29, 2016ATTACHMENT TO COMPLAINT BILL OF SALE AND ASSIGNMENT
Date: December 29, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 21, 2018 | Docket Event |
MASTER ORDER OF DISMISSAL Doc # 2 SORIANO, AUGUSTUS S Vol./Book 20286, Page 1, 91 pages
Judge: CARASSAS, JOHN |
|
September 21, 2018 | Docket Event |
CASE DISMISSED - AFTER HEARING (SRS DISPOSITION) Doc # 3
Judge: CARASSAS, JOHN |
|
September 18, 2018 | Docket Event |
DISMISSAL DATE FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION (12:00 AM) (Judicial Officer CARASSAS, JOHN)
Judge: CARASSAS, JOHN |
|
July 18, 2018 | Docket Event |
NOTICE-LACK OF PROSECUTION MAILED TO ALL PARTIES Doc # 1
Judge: CARASSAS, JOHN |
|
January 23, 2017 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS - SERVED 011417 Party: SORIANO, AUGUSTUS S
Judge: CARASSAS, JOHN |
|
December 29, 2016 | Docket Event |
ATTACHMENT TO COMPLAINT ACCOUNT ACTIVITY
Judge: CARASSAS, JOHN |
|
December 29, 2016 | Docket Event |
ATTACHMENT TO COMPLAINT LOAN
Judge: CARASSAS, JOHN |
|
December 29, 2016 | Docket Event |
ATTACHMENT TO COMPLAINT BILL OF SALE AND ASSIGNMENT
Judge: CARASSAS, JOHN |
|
December 29, 2016 | Docket Event |
CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED
Judge: CARASSAS, JOHN |
|
December 29, 2016 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED ISSUED Party: SORIANO, AUGUSTUS S
Judge: CARASSAS, JOHN |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.