Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Kings Manor Estates Llc, filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case represented by Lindsey M Porter, against Renteria, Jose, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with HESSINGER, KATHLEEN T presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHESSINGER, KATHLEEN T Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 29, 2016 |
CategoryDelinquent Tenant - County |
Last RefreshedSeptember 08, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
This complaint is filed by Kings Manor Estates, LLC against Jose Renteria in the County Court for Pinellas County, Florida. The complaint is divided into two counts.
Count I is for mobile home eviction. Kings Manor Estates is the managing agent and ...
COMPLAINT WITH ATTACHMENTS
Date: December 29, 2016CERTIFICATE OF MAILING Party: RENTERIA, JOSE
Date: January 03, 2017FINAL DISPOSITION FORM
Date: January 12, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 08, 2017 | Docket Event |
WRIT OF POSSESSION EXECUTED
Judge: HESSINGER, KATHLEEN T |
|
January 30, 2017 | Docket Event |
WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED TO ATTY
Judge: HESSINGER, KATHLEEN T |
|
January 18, 2017 | Docket Event |
FINAL JUDGMENT- COUNT 1 POSSESSION Vol./Book 19489, Page 1205, 1 pages
Judge: HESSINGER, KATHLEEN T |
|
January 18, 2017 | Docket Event |
DEFAULT JUDGMENT (SRS DISPO)
Judge: HESSINGER, KATHLEEN T |
|
January 13, 2017 | Docket Event |
DEFAULT ENTERED Party: RENTERIA, JOSE
Judge: HESSINGER, KATHLEEN T |
|
January 12, 2017 | Docket Event |
FINAL DISPOSITION FORM
Judge: HESSINGER, KATHLEEN T |
|
January 12, 2017 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS SERVED - POSTED 010217 Party: RENTERIA, JOSE
Judge: HESSINGER, KATHLEEN T |
|
January 12, 2017 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT Party: KINGS MANOR ESTATES LLC
Judge: HESSINGER, KATHLEEN T |
|
January 12, 2017 | Docket Event |
VERIFICATION OF CLAIM AND NON-MILITARY SERVICE
Judge: HESSINGER, KATHLEEN T |
|
January 12, 2017 | Docket Event |
PLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT ENTERED Party: KINGS MANOR ESTATES LLC
Judge: HESSINGER, KATHLEEN T |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.