Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Merion Bay Point Lp A Delaware Limited Partnership Authorized To Do Business In Florida, filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case represented by Charles V Barrett, Iii, against Russell, Kenneth A, Russell, Yvonne, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with McNARY, MYRA SCOTT presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMcNARY, MYRA SCOTT Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 29, 2016 |
CategoryDelinquent Tenant - County |
Last RefreshedSeptember 08, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED
Date: December 29, 2016ANSWER OF Party: RUSSELL, YVONNE
Date: January 06, 2017CERTIFICATE OF MAILING Party: RUSSELL, KENNETH A Party: RUSSELL, YVONNE
Date: December 30, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 07, 2017 | Docket Event |
(NON RECORDED) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL AS TO COUNT II W/O PREJUDICE BY PLTF
Judge: McNARY, MYRA SCOTT |
|
February 01, 2017 | Docket Event |
WRIT OF POSSESSION EXECUTED
Judge: McNARY, MYRA SCOTT |
|
January 24, 2017 | Docket Event |
FINAL DISPOSITION FORM
Judge: McNARY, MYRA SCOTT |
|
January 24, 2017 | Docket Event |
WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED TO ATTORNEY
Judge: McNARY, MYRA SCOTT |
|
January 23, 2017 | Docket Event |
DEFAULT ENTERED BY COURT Party: RUSSELL, KENNETH A Party: RUSSELL, YVONNE
Judge: McNARY, MYRA SCOTT |
|
January 23, 2017 | Docket Event |
FINAL JUDGMENT- COUNT 1 POSSESSION Vol./Book 19493, Page 2381, 1 pages
Judge: McNARY, MYRA SCOTT |
|
January 23, 2017 | Docket Event |
JUDGMENT (SRS)
Judge: McNARY, MYRA SCOTT |
|
January 19, 2017 | Docket Event |
PLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR IMMEDIATE DEFAUL AND DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT---DEFAULT NOT ENTERED / ANSWER FILED (YVONNE) / NO DEFAULT SUBMITTED
Judge: McNARY, MYRA SCOTT |
|
January 19, 2017 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS SERVED - POSTED 123116 Party: RUSSELL, YVONNE
Judge: McNARY, MYRA SCOTT |
|
January 19, 2017 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS SERVED - POSTED 123116 Party: RUSSELL, KENNETH A
Judge: McNARY, MYRA SCOTT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.