Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Glen Ellen Mobile Home Park Lp, filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case represented by Stanley L Martin, Esq, against Mcghen, Janice Marie, Younger, Anne Marie, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with HESSINGER, KATHLEEN T presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHESSINGER, KATHLEEN T Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 29, 2016 |
CategoryDelinquent Tenant - County |
Last RefreshedSeptember 08, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
COMPLAINT
Date: December 29, 2016DEFAULT ENTERED Party: MCGHEN, JANICE MARIE Party: YOUNGER, ANNE MARIE
Date: January 19, 2017CERTIFICATE OF MAILING Party: MCGHEN, JANICE MARIE Party: YOUNGER, ANNE MARIE
Date: January 05, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 12, 2019 | Docket Event |
CORRESPONDENCE TO CLERK RE Doc # 2 TRANSUNION RENTAL SCREENING SOLUTIONS IN RECEIPT OF CONSUMER DISPUTE
Judge: HESSINGER, KATHLEEN T |
|
July 29, 2019 | Docket Event |
CORRESPONDENCE TO CLERK RE Doc # 1 CONSUMER DISPUTE RECEIVED BY TRANSUNION RENTAL SCREENING SOLUTIONS
Judge: HESSINGER, KATHLEEN T |
|
March 07, 2017 | Docket Event |
WRIT OF POSSESSION RETD EXECUTED
Judge: HESSINGER, KATHLEEN T |
|
February 21, 2017 | Docket Event |
WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED TO ATTORNEY
Judge: HESSINGER, KATHLEEN T |
|
February 03, 2017 | Docket Event |
FINAL JUDGMENT- COUNT 1 POSSESSION Vol./Book 19509, Page 1176, 1 pages
Judge: HESSINGER, KATHLEEN T |
|
February 03, 2017 | Docket Event |
DEFAULT JUDGMENT (SRS DISPO)
Judge: HESSINGER, KATHLEEN T |
|
February 01, 2017 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT Party: GLEN ELLEN MOBILE HOME PARK LP
Judge: HESSINGER, KATHLEEN T |
|
January 19, 2017 | Docket Event |
DEFAULT ENTERED Party: MCGHEN, JANICE MARIE Party: YOUNGER, ANNE MARIE
Judge: HESSINGER, KATHLEEN T |
|
January 17, 2017 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE
Judge: HESSINGER, KATHLEEN T |
|
January 17, 2017 | Docket Event |
PLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT ENTERED Party: GLEN ELLEN MOBILE HOME PARK LP
Judge: HESSINGER, KATHLEEN T |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.