Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Us Bank Na, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Bryan S Jones, Esq, Samantha Darrigo, Esq, against Atlantic Credit And Finance Inc, Cane, Mike, Cannon, Anthony M, City Of St Petersburg Florida, Naas, Megan J, (total of 7) See All represented by Richard B Badgley, Ryan C Torrens, Esq, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with JIROTKA, GEORGE M presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJIROTKA, GEORGE M Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 30, 2016 |
CategoryReal Prop - Non-Homestead Res Foreclosure3 $250,000 Or More |
Last RefreshedOctober 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS(ES) Doc # 63
Date: January 20, 2020NOTICE Doc # 70 OF CHANGE OF COUNSEL AND AMENDED DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES
Date: June 30, 2020NOTICE OF SERVICE OF Doc # 69 ATTACHED COPY OF AGREE ORDER FOR SUBSTITUTION OF PLTFS COUNSEL
Date: January 30, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 30, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE Doc # 70 OF CHANGE OF COUNSEL AND AMENDED DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES | |
January 30, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVICE OF Doc # 69 ATTACHED COPY OF AGREE ORDER FOR SUBSTITUTION OF PLTFS COUNSEL | |
January 30, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVICE OF Doc # 69ATTACHED COPY OF AGREE ORDER FOR SUBSTITUTION OF PLTFS COUNSEL | |
January 27, 2020 | Docket Event | ORDER FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL Doc # 64 (AGREED) FOR PLAINTIFF | |
January 27, 2020 | Docket Event | CORRESPONDENCE TO COURT RE Doc # 65 PROPOSED AGREED ORDER W/ATTACHED | |
January 27, 2020 | Docket Event | REOPEN - CLOSED Doc # 67 | |
January 27, 2020 | Docket Event | REOPEN - CLOSED Doc # 67 | |
January 27, 2020 | Docket Event | ORDER FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL Doc # 64(AGREED) FOR PLAINTIFF | |
January 27, 2020 | Docket Event | CORRESPONDENCE TO COURT RE Doc # 65PROPOSED AGREED ORDER W/ATTACHED | |
January 24, 2020 | Docket Event | PLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL Doc # 68 W/ATTACHED CONSENT AS EXHIBIT "A" Party: US BANK NA |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.