Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Perez, Laudismin, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Royce C Haddad, Jr, against Diamantakos, James M, represented by Kristin Karbowski, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with SCHAEFER, JOHN A presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSCHAEFER, JOHN A Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 30, 2016 |
CategoryAuto Negligence - Circuit |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 09, 2018 | Docket Event | (NON RECORDED) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Doc # 5W/PREJUDICE BYParty: PEREZ, LAUDISMIN | |
February 09, 2018 | Docket Event | CASE DISMISSED - BEFORE HEARING (SRS DISPOSITION) Doc # 4 | |
November 01, 2017 | Docket Event | NOT. OF SERV. OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT Doc # 2 | |
November 01, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE FINAL DISPOSITION OF REFERRAL Doc # 3DID NOT REACH AGREEMENT | |
October 31, 2017 | Docket Event | NOT. OF SERV. OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT Doc # 1 | |
August 15, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE103017 9:00 | |
May 15, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVICE ANSWERS INTERROGATORIES | |
May 10, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVICE ANSWERS INTERROGATORIES | |
May 03, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCEAND NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS | |
April 21, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.