Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Adkins, Eugene T By And Through Glen J Adkins Attonrey In Fact, filed a(n) Nursing Home - Torts case represented by Michael Karl Beck, against Arden Courts Of Seminole Fl Llc, Hcr Iii Healthcare Llc, Hcr Manorcare Inc As To Arden Courts Of Seminole, Manor Care Inc, represented by Rhonda L Beesing, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with MINKOFF, THOMAS H presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMINKOFF, THOMAS H Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 31, 2016 |
CategoryNegligence - Nursing Home |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeNursing Home |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 31, 2019 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTING Doc # 228PLTF MOTION TO ATTEND HEARING VIA TELEPHONE | |
December 31, 2019 | Docket Event | CORRESPONDENCE TO COURT RE Doc # 227PROPOSED ORDER- RECEIVED BY COURT 122619 | |
December 16, 2019 | Docket Event | PLTF-PET'S MOTION Doc # 226TO ATTEND HEARING VIA TELEPHONE | |
December 16, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING Doc # 225030220 3;30 (TELEPHONIC) | |
November 27, 2019 | Docket Event | PLTF-PET'S MOTION Doc # 224FOR COURT APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT | |
August 30, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE Doc # 223OF SETTLEMENT | |
August 27, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CANCELLATION Doc # 222OF DEPOSITION | |
August 27, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CANCELLATION Doc # 221OF DEPOSITION | |
August 27, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CANCELLATION Doc # 220OF DEPOSITION | |
August 26, 2019 | Docket Event | RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION Doc # 218SUPPLEMENTAL RESPONSES TO THIRD REQUEST |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.