Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Mcgoldrick, Bernard, filed a(n) Other Civil - Circuit case represented by Mohamad A Akbik, Esq, against Benevento, Harry, Benevento, Linda, represented by Eric W Neilsen, Esq, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with MEYER, KEITH presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMEYER, KEITH Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 31, 2016 |
CategoryOther Civil - Circuit |
Last RefreshedSeptember 07, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
|
PLTF-PET'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW Doc # 2 AS COUNSEL
Date: April 30, 2018NOTICE OF HEARING Doc # 4 052219 9:00
Date: May 17, 2019ORDER GRANTING Doc # 5 WITHDRAWAL OF PLTFS COUNSEL
Date: June 19, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 11, 2020 | Docket Event |
ORDER Doc # 7 APPROVING SETTLEMENT
Judge: MEYER, KEITH |
|
June 25, 2019 | Docket Event | CANCELED DISMISSAL DATE FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION (12:00 AM) (Judicial Officer SCHAEFER, JOHN A) CURRENT ACTIVITY | |
June 25, 2019 | Docket Event |
CANCELED DISMISSAL DATE FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION (12:00 AM) (Judicial Officer SCHAEFER, JOHN A) CURRENT ACTIVITY
Judge: MEYER, KEITH |
|
June 19, 2019 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTING Doc # 5WITHDRAWAL OF PLTFS COUNSEL | |
June 19, 2019 | Docket Event | CORRESPONDENCE TO COURT RE Doc # 6PROPOSED ORDER RCVD BY COURT 060519 | |
June 19, 2019 | Docket Event |
ORDER GRANTING Doc # 5 WITHDRAWAL OF PLTFS COUNSEL
Judge: MEYER, KEITH |
|
June 19, 2019 | Docket Event |
CORRESPONDENCE TO COURT RE Doc # 6 PROPOSED ORDER RCVD BY COURT 060519
Judge: MEYER, KEITH |
|
May 17, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING Doc # 4052219 9:00 | |
May 17, 2019 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING Doc # 4 052219 9:00
Judge: MEYER, KEITH |
|
April 24, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE-LACK OF PROSECUTION MAILED TO ALL PARTIES Doc # 3 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.