Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Rollins, Felmonla, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Chelsie M Lamie, against Leveque, Amy, represented by Steven D Manno, Esq, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with NEWTON, CYNTHIA J presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeNEWTON, CYNTHIA J Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 31, 2016 |
CategoryAuto Negligence - Circuit |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 10, 2016 | Docket Event | (NON RECORDED) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSALW/ PREJUDICE | |
November 10, 2016 | Docket Event | CASE DISMISSED - BEFORE HEARING (SRS DISPOSITION) | |
November 10, 2016 | Docket Event |
(NON RECORDED) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL W/ PREJUDICE
Judge: NEWTON, CYNTHIA J |
|
October 25, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CANCELLATIONOF HEARING 11/16/2016 9:15 | |
October 25, 2016 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING 11/16/2016 9:15
Judge: NEWTON, CYNTHIA J |
|
October 21, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ACCEPTANCE OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT | |
October 10, 2016 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF NON-OBJECTION | |
October 04, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING111616 9:15 | |
October 04, 2016 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING 111616 9:15
Judge: NEWTON, CYNTHIA J |
|
October 03, 2016 | Docket Event | AMENDED NOTICE MEDIATION CONFERENCE012417 9:00 (SECOND) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.