Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Crook, Michael, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Stanley T Padgett, Esq, against Reinhold, Christopher Steven, Reicon Llc, My Billpay Llc, Euro Customs Llc, represented by Derek R Young, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with MINKOFF, THOMAS H presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMINKOFF, THOMAS H Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 27, 2016 |
CategoryContracts And Indebtedness - Circuit |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 28, 2018 | Docket Event | MASTER ORDER OF DISMISSAL Doc # 4EURO CUSTOMS LLC / REICON LLC / EURO CUSTOMS LLC / REINHOLD, CHRISTOPHER STEVEN / MY BILLPAY LLC / REICON LLCVol./Book 20292, Page 396, 4 pages | |
September 28, 2018 | Docket Event | CASE DISMISSED - AFTER HEARING (SRS DISPOSITION) Doc # 5 | |
September 18, 2018 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL DATE FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION (12:00 AM) (Judicial Officer MINKOFF, THOMAS H) | |
August 21, 2018 | Docket Event | CANCELED DISMISSAL DATE FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION (12:00 AM) (Judicial Officer MINKOFF, THOMAS H) OTHER | |
August 13, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF LACK OF PROSECUTION RETD BY P.O. Doc # 3UNKNOWN ADDRESS FOR DEFT MY BILLPAY LLC | |
August 02, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF LACK OF PROSECUTION RETD BY P.O. Doc # 2RETURN TO SENDER/ATTEMPTED NOT KNOWN/EURO CUSTOMS LLC | |
July 18, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE-LACK OF PROSECUTION MAILED TO ALL PARTIES Doc # 1 | |
June 26, 2017 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTINGWITHDRAWAL OF PLTFS COUNSEL | |
June 26, 2017 | Docket Event | ATTORNEY COVER LETTER--- COURT RECEIVED 061917 | |
May 30, 2017 | Docket Event | PLTF-PET'S MOTION TO WITHDRAWAS COUNSEL FOR PLTF |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.