Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Wilmington Savings Fund Society Fsb, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Matthew B Leider, against All Unknown Parties Etc, Bank Of America Na, Barker, Brian L, Barker, Lynn S, Palms Of Tierra Homeowners Association Inc, (total of 12) See All represented by Aaron J Silberman, Esq, Amy Mcgrotty, Michael Fuino, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with NEWTON, CYNTHIA J presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeNEWTON, CYNTHIA J Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 27, 2016 |
CategoryReal Prop - Non-Homestead Res Foreclosure3 $250,000 Or More |
Last RefreshedDecember 03, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
This complaint, filed in the Circuit Court of Pinellas County, Florida, is between Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, doing business as Christiana Trust, as the plaintiff, and Brian L. Barker, et al., as the defendant. The case number is 16-3541-C...
AMENDED NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS Doc # 3 Vol./Book 19812, Page 289, 1 pages
Date: October 17, 2017JOINT STIPULATION Doc # 8 FOR ENTRY OF CONSENT TO FINAL JUDGMENT
Date: November 15, 2017SUMMONS-AMEND COMPLAINT RETURNED SERVED Doc # 7 110117 Party: BARKER, LYNN S
Date: November 13, 2017CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE WITH FORECLOSURE PROCEDURES Doc # 10
Date: December 06, 2017SUMMONS-AMEND COMPLAINT RETURNED SERVED Doc # 6 110117 Party: BARKER, BRIAN L
Date: November 13, 2017NOTICE OF SALE Doc # 14 ESF PAID
Date: December 14, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 14, 2018 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF TITLE Doc # 20AMENDEDVol./Book 19942, Page 1826, 1 pages | |
February 14, 2018 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF TITLE Doc # 20 AMENDED Vol./Book 19942, Page 1826, 1 pages
Judge: NEWTON, CYNTHIA J |
|
February 07, 2018 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF NO DISBURSEMENT Doc # 19 | |
February 07, 2018 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF TITLE Doc # 18Vol./Book 19935, Page 767, 1 pages | |
February 07, 2018 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF NO DISBURSEMENT Doc # 19
Judge: NEWTON, CYNTHIA J |
|
February 07, 2018 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF TITLE Doc # 18 Vol./Book 19935, Page 767, 1 pages
Judge: NEWTON, CYNTHIA J |
|
January 25, 2018 | Docket Event | JUDICIAL ONLINE SALE (10:00 AM) (Judicial Officer ONLINE SALE, JUDICIAL) REC VER | |
January 25, 2018 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF SALE Doc # 17WILMINGTON SAVINGS FUND SOCIETY FSB | |
January 25, 2018 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF SALE Doc # 17 WILMINGTON SAVINGS FUND SOCIETY FSB
Judge: NEWTON, CYNTHIA J |
|
January 25, 2018 | Docket Event |
JUDICIAL ONLINE SALE (10:00 AM) (Judicial Officer ONLINE SALE, JUDICIAL) REC VER
Judge: NEWTON, CYNTHIA J |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.