Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Wells Fargo Financial System Florida Inc, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Teodora Siderova, against Any And All Unknown Parties Etc, Unknown Heirs Etc Against Patricia L Grey Deceased, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with JIROTKA, GEORGE M presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJIROTKA, GEORGE M Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 27, 2016 |
CategoryReal Prop - Homestead Res Foreclosure2 $50,001 - $249,999 |
Last RefreshedSeptember 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE Doc # 1 (LIMITED) AND EMAIL DESIGNATION Party: US BANK TRUST NA
Date: October 19, 2017MOTION WRIT OF POSSESSION Doc # 2 W/ATTACHED EXHIBIT Party: US BANK TRUST NA
Date: October 19, 2017WRIT OF POSSESSION Doc # 6 NOT ISSUED / NO ORDER DIRECTING CLERK TO ISSUE
Date: February 01, 2018WRIT OF POSSESSION Doc # 12 ISSUED
Date: February 21, 2018ORDER Doc # 14 CLOSING CASE
Date: June 25, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 25, 2019 | Docket Event | ORDER Doc # 14CLOSING CASE | |
June 25, 2019 | Docket Event |
ORDER Doc # 14 CLOSING CASE
Judge: JIROTKA, GEORGE M |
|
March 02, 2018 | Docket Event | WRIT OF POSSESSION Doc # 13EXECUTED | |
March 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
WRIT OF POSSESSION Doc # 13 EXECUTED
Judge: JIROTKA, GEORGE M |
|
February 21, 2018 | Docket Event | WRIT OF POSSESSION Doc # 12ISSUED | |
February 21, 2018 | Docket Event |
WRIT OF POSSESSION Doc # 12 ISSUED
Judge: JIROTKA, GEORGE M |
|
February 16, 2018 | Docket Event | ORDER - NOT SIGNED BY COURT Doc # 9ON PURCHASERS MTN FOR ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION | |
February 16, 2018 | Docket Event | ORDER DIRECTING CLERK TO ISSUE WRIT OF POSSESSION Doc # 8 | |
February 16, 2018 | Docket Event | CORRESPONDENCE FROM CLERK RE Doc # 7RETD WRIT OF POSS TO ATTY TO BE EFILED AND CHECK #31119 AMT $90.00 | |
February 16, 2018 | Docket Event | CORRESPONDENCE TO COURT RE Doc # 11PROPOSED ORDER - RECEIVED BY COURT 021518 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.