Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Us Bank National Association, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Shikita Parker, Esq, against Gonzalez, William C, Hawthorne, Elma E, Hawthorne, Howard R, Irizarry, Nancy, Unknown Heirs Of The Estate Of Elma E Hawthorne, (total of 7) See All in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with MUSCARELLA, PATRICIA ANN presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMUSCARELLA, PATRICIA ANN Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 26, 2016 |
CategoryReal Prop - Homestead Res Foreclosure2 $50,001 - $249,999 |
Last RefreshedSeptember 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
PROPOSED ORDER UNSIGNED Doc # 5 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO AMEND FINAL JUDGMENT
Date: October 25, 2017NOTICE OF HEARING Doc # 7 113017 2:00 (TELEPHONIC)
Date: November 09, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 13, 2020 | Docket Event |
RETURNED FROM POST OFFICE Doc # 17 COPY LETTER FROM CLERK RE: UNCLAIMED FUNDS
Judge: MUSCARELLA, PATRICIA ANN |
|
April 23, 2020 | Docket Event |
UNCLAIMED SURPLUS FUNDS DEPOSITED WITH STATE UNDER F.S.717 Doc # 16 2019 FORECLOSURE SURPLUS FUNDS DEPOSITED IN 2020
Judge: MUSCARELLA, PATRICIA ANN |
|
January 24, 2020 | Docket Event | FS 717 FORECLOSURE SURPLUS FUNDS TO BE REPORTED AS UNCLAIMED | |
January 24, 2020 | Docket Event | DUE DILIGENCE LETTER RE UNCLAIMED FORECLOSURE SURPLUS FUNDS Doc # 15Party: IRIZARRY, NANCY | |
January 24, 2020 | Docket Event |
DUE DILIGENCE LETTER RE UNCLAIMED FORECLOSURE SURPLUS FUNDS Doc # 15 Party: IRIZARRY, NANCY
Judge: MUSCARELLA, PATRICIA ANN |
|
July 23, 2019 | Docket Event | TERMINATION OF SURPLUS TRUSTEE Doc # 14 | |
July 23, 2019 | Docket Event |
TERMINATION OF SURPLUS TRUSTEE Doc # 14
Judge: MUSCARELLA, PATRICIA ANN |
|
July 17, 2018 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR SURPLUS TRUSTEE SENT TO STATE Doc # 12 | |
July 17, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPT OF SURPLUS TRUSTEE Doc # 13 | |
July 17, 2018 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF APPT OF SURPLUS TRUSTEE Doc # 13
Judge: MUSCARELLA, PATRICIA ANN |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.