Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Jones, Jodi, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Brian L Barker, against State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, represented by Nina M Hanson, Esq, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with MINKOFF, THOMAS H presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMINKOFF, THOMAS H Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 26, 2016 |
CategoryAuto Negligence - Circuit |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 18, 2018 | Docket Event | FINAL ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE Doc # 15Vol./Book 20381, Page 2332, 1 pages | |
December 18, 2018 | Docket Event | CORRESPONDENCE TO COURT RE Doc # 14PROPOSED ORDER | |
December 12, 2018 | Docket Event | FINAL ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE Doc # 13Vol./Book 20373, Page 982, 1 pages | |
November 16, 2018 | Docket Event | JOINT STIPULATION Doc # 12FOR FINAL ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AND WITHOUT TAXATION OF COSTS | |
November 16, 2018 | Docket Event | FINAL DISPOSITION FORM Doc # 11 | |
November 16, 2018 | Docket Event | CASE DISMISSED - AFTER HEARING (SRS DISPOSITION) Doc # 10 | |
October 23, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE FINAL DISPOSITION OF REFERRAL Doc # 9FULL AGREEMENT | |
August 31, 2018 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE Doc # 8(MEDIATION) OF AUTHORITY | |
August 02, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE Doc # 7100818 9:30 | |
July 25, 2018 | Docket Event | PLTF-PET'S MOTION TO PARTICIPATE IN CIRCUIT CIVIL MEDIATION Doc # 6 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.