Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Bay Area Auto Glass Llc, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case represented by John A Russo, against Geico General Insurance Company, represented by Lindsey R Trowell, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with CARASSAS, JOHN presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCARASSAS, JOHN Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 28, 2016 |
CategorySmall Claims 3 - $501 - $2,500 |
Last RefreshedOctober 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION
Date: January 28, 2016REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS
Date: January 28, 2016SUMMONS-NOTICE EMAILED TO ATTY-PLTF FOR SERVICE Party: GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Date: February 01, 2016RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS
Date: March 24, 2016EXHIBIT A INVOICE
Date: January 28, 2016NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES
Date: October 27, 2016NOTICE-STMT OF CLAIM-DEFT Party: GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Date: February 01, 2016CORRESPONDENCE RE: FILING INSTRUCTIONS
Date: January 28, 2016NOTICE OF CANCELLATION Doc # 1 OF DEPO
Date: September 01, 2017NOTICE OF SERVICE ANSWERS INTERROGATORIES
Date: November 28, 2016STATEMENT OF CLAIM
Date: January 28, 2016NOTICE OF APPEARANCE /DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS
Date: March 23, 2016NOTICE TO PLTF-PLTF ATTY
Date: February 01, 2016NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION OF CORPORATE REPRESENTATIVE
Date: August 01, 2017NOTICE OF GOOD CAUSE
Date: July 19, 2017NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY Doc # 3
Date: April 16, 2018NOTICE OF GOOD CAUSE Doc # 4
Date: April 25, 2018NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Doc # 9 WITH PREJUDICE
Date: November 05, 2020NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Doc # 8 W/O PREJUDICE GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY
Date: May 24, 2019NOTICE OF SERVICE OF Doc # 6 OFFER OF JUDGMENT
Date: January 24, 2019NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY Doc # 5
Date: September 26, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 05, 2020 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Doc # 9 WITH PREJUDICE
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, NORTH |
|
May 24, 2019 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Doc # 8 W/O PREJUDICE GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, NORTH |
|
May 24, 2019 | Docket Event |
CASE DISMISSED - AFTER HEARING (SRS DISPOSITION) Doc # 7
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, NORTH |
|
January 24, 2019 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SERVICE OF Doc # 6 OFFER OF JUDGMENT
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, NORTH |
|
September 26, 2018 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY Doc # 5
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, NORTH |
|
May 08, 2018 | Docket Event |
CANCELED DISMISSAL-FAILURE TO PROSECUTE-SC (12:00 AM) (Judicial Officer CARASSAS, JOHN) CURRENT ACTIVITY
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, NORTH |
|
April 25, 2018 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF GOOD CAUSE Doc # 4
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, NORTH |
|
April 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY Doc # 3
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, NORTH |
|
April 06, 2018 | Docket Event |
NOTICE-LACK OF PROSECUTION MAILED TO ALL PARTIES Doc # 2
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, NORTH |
|
September 01, 2017 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF CANCELLATION Doc # 1 OF DEPO
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, NORTH |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.