Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Niehaus, Darlene F, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Carlson Duga, Joanne L, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with MUSCARELLA, PATRICIA ANN presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMUSCARELLA, PATRICIA ANN Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 28, 2016 |
CategoryDomestic - Stalking Injunction |
Last RefreshedOctober 13, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 04, 2016 | Docket Event |
CERTIFIED COPY ORDR DISMISSAL RETD BY PO
Judge: MUSCARELLA, PATRICIA ANN |
|
February 23, 2016 | Docket Event |
FINAL DISPOSITION FORM
Judge: MUSCARELLA, PATRICIA ANN |
|
February 19, 2016 | Docket Event |
ORDER OF DISMISSAL OF INJUNCTION Vol./Book 19094, Page 1193, 1 pages
Judge: MUSCARELLA, PATRICIA ANN |
|
February 19, 2016 | Docket Event |
DOMESTIC INJUNCTION - STALKING (1:15 PM) (Judicial Officer RAMSBERGER, PETER)
Judge: MUSCARELLA, PATRICIA ANN |
|
February 19, 2016 | Docket Event |
ORDER OF DISMISSAL OF INJUNCTION (SRS DISPO) Vol./Book 19094, Page 1193, 1 pages
Judge: MUSCARELLA, PATRICIA ANN |
|
February 18, 2016 | Docket Event |
RETURNED FROM POST OFFICE COPY OF ORDER
Judge: MUSCARELLA, PATRICIA ANN |
|
February 05, 2016 | Docket Event |
DOMESTIC INJUNCTION - STALKING (1:15 PM) (Judicial Officer RAMSBERGER, PETER)
Judge: MUSCARELLA, PATRICIA ANN |
|
February 05, 2016 | Docket Event |
ORDER OF CONTINUANCE /RESCHEDULING RETURN HEARING 021916 1:15
Judge: MUSCARELLA, PATRICIA ANN |
|
February 05, 2016 | Docket Event |
CANCELED DOMESTIC INJUNCTION - STALKING (1:15 PM) (Judicial Officer RAMSBERGER, PETER) DATA ENTRY ERROR
Judge: MUSCARELLA, PATRICIA ANN |
|
February 02, 2016 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE TEMP INJ 012816
Judge: MUSCARELLA, PATRICIA ANN |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.