Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Mcarthur, Jim, filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case against Fuller, Tiffany, Rivers, Carl, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with JAGGER, EDWIN presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJAGGER, EDWIN Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 28, 2016 |
CategoryDelinquent Tenant - County |
Last RefreshedOctober 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
This complaint is filed by Jim McArthur as the trustee of Trust 11365 against defendants Carl Rivers and Tiffany Fuller. The complaint is for eviction and damages. In Count I, the plaintiff seeks to evict the defendants from a property located at 113...
SUMMONS ISSUED AT COUNTER Party: RIVERS, CARL
Date: January 28, 2016CERTIFICATE OF MAILING Party: FULLER, TIFFANY Party: RIVERS, CARL
Date: January 29, 2016CERTIFICATE OF MAILING Party: FULLER, TIFFANY Party: RIVERS, CARL
Date: February 12, 2016ORDER DENYING DEFT MOTION TO VACATE JUDGMENT
Date: February 25, 2016FINAL JUDGMENT- COUNT 1 POSSESSION Vol./Book 19088, Page 550, 1 pages
Date: February 17, 2016PLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR COURT DEFAULT
Date: February 11, 2016COMPLAINT - II COUNTS
Date: January 28, 2016CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: January 28, 2016WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED TO SHERIFF
Date: March 18, 2016SUMMONS SERVED - POSTED 012916 Party: RIVERS, CARL
Date: February 01, 2016WRIT OF POSSESSION RETD EXECUTED
Date: March 24, 2016PLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT
Date: February 11, 2016FINAL DISPOSITION FORM
Date: February 17, 2016AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE / AFFIDAVIT IN PROOF OF CLAIM
Date: February 11, 2016NOTICE OF HEARING 022416 2:45
Date: February 19, 2016EXHIBIT THREE DAY NOTICE
Date: January 28, 2016DEFAULT ENTERED CT1 Party: FULLER, TIFFANY Party: RIVERS, CARL
Date: February 16, 2016SUMMONS SERVED - POSTED 012916 Party: FULLER, TIFFANY
Date: February 01, 2016DEF-RESP'S EMERGENCY MOTION TO VACATE JUDGMENT
Date: February 19, 2016SUMMONS ISSUED AT COUNTER Party: FULLER, TIFFANY
Date: January 28, 2016PLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT
Date: February 11, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 24, 2016 | Docket Event |
WRIT OF POSSESSION RETD EXECUTED
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
March 18, 2016 | Docket Event |
WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED TO SHERIFF
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
March 17, 2016 | Docket Event |
WRIT OF POSSESSION RECEIVED WITH CHECK
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
February 25, 2016 | Docket Event |
ORDER DENYING DEFT MOTION TO VACATE JUDGMENT
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
February 24, 2016 | Docket Event |
MOTION TO VACATE (2:45 PM) (Judicial Officer JAGGER, EDWIN)
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
February 19, 2016 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING 022416 2:45
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
February 19, 2016 | Docket Event |
DEF-RESP'S EMERGENCY MOTION TO VACATE JUDGMENT
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
February 17, 2016 | Docket Event |
FINAL JUDGMENT- COUNT 1 POSSESSION Vol./Book 19088, Page 550, 1 pages
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
February 17, 2016 | Docket Event |
FINAL DISPOSITION FORM
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
February 17, 2016 | Docket Event |
DEFAULT JUDGMENT (SRS DISPO)
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.