Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Greenwood Apartments Llc, filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case represented by Jaimon H Perry, against Williams, Vostelle, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with KELLY, LORRAINE presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKELLY, LORRAINE Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 28, 2016 |
CategoryDelinquent Tenant - County |
Last RefreshedDecember 09, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
This complaint is a lease contract between the resident, Vostelle Williams, and the owner of the apartment. The lease contract states that any security deposit or advance rent paid by the resident is being held in a separate non-interest bearing acco...
ATTACHMENT TO COMPLAINT LEASE
Date: January 28, 2016COMPLAINT
Date: January 28, 2016SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED ISSUED ON 012816 Party: WILLIAMS, VOSTELLE
Date: January 28, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 19, 2019 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF FORFEITURE OF UNCLAIMED MONEY UNDER F.S.116.21 Doc # 2 2019 REPORT PUBLICATION
Judge: KELLY, LORRAINE |
|
April 07, 2017 | Docket Event |
MASTER ORDER OF DISMISSAL WILLIAMS, VOSTELLE Vol./Book 19589, Page 475, 5 pages
Judge: KELLY, LORRAINE |
|
April 07, 2017 | Docket Event |
CASE DISMISSED - BEFORE HEARING (SRS DISPOSITION)
Judge: KELLY, LORRAINE |
|
April 04, 2017 | Docket Event |
DISMISSAL DATE FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION (12:00 AM) (Judicial Officer KELLY, LORRAINE)
Judge: KELLY, LORRAINE |
|
February 01, 2017 | Docket Event |
NOTICE-LACK OF PROSECUTION MAILED TO ALL PARTIES
Judge: KELLY, LORRAINE |
|
February 23, 2016 | Docket Event |
DEFAULT TO BE ISSUED DEFAULT NOT ENTERED - DEF DEPOSITED INTO COURT REGISTRY
Judge: KELLY, LORRAINE |
|
February 23, 2016 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR DEFAULT DEFAULT NOT ENTERED - DEF DEPOSITED INTO COURT REGISTRY Party: GREENWOOD APARTMENTS LLC
Judge: KELLY, LORRAINE |
|
February 10, 2016 | Docket Event |
Court Registry - Delnt. Ten. Deposit $ 780.94
Judge: KELLY, LORRAINE |
|
February 08, 2016 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT-SERVICE OF PROCESS 020516 Party: WILLIAMS, VOSTELLE
Judge: KELLY, LORRAINE |
|
January 28, 2016 | Docket Event |
ATTACHMENT TO COMPLAINT LEASE
Judge: KELLY, LORRAINE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.