Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Kostantinov, Jovan, filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case represented by Tyrone Zdravko, Esq, against Livingston, Kimberly, Unkown Tenants, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with CARASSAS, JOHN presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCARASSAS, JOHN Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 28, 2016 |
CategoryDelinquent Tenant - County |
Last RefreshedSeptember 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
This complaint is a legal action for tenant eviction in Pinellas County, Florida. The plaintiff, Jovan Kostantinov, is suing the defendants, Kimberly Livingston and unknown tenants, for eviction from a property located at 1672 South Frederica Avenue,...
(NON RECORDED) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE
Date: March 09, 2016COURT WORKSHEET
Date: March 04, 2016SUMMONS - SERVED 012916 Party: LIVINGSTON, KIMBERLY
Date: February 03, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 09, 2016 | Docket Event |
(NON RECORDED) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE
Judge: CARASSAS, JOHN |
|
March 09, 2016 | Docket Event |
CASE DISMISSED - AFTER HEARING (SRS DISPOSITION)
Judge: CARASSAS, JOHN |
|
March 04, 2016 | Docket Event |
COURT WORKSHEET
Judge: CARASSAS, JOHN |
|
February 09, 2016 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING 030416 11:30
Judge: CARASSAS, JOHN |
|
February 05, 2016 | Docket Event |
ANSWER OF Party: LIVINGSTON, KIMBERLY
Judge: CARASSAS, JOHN |
|
February 03, 2016 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS - SERVED 012916 Party: LIVINGSTON, KIMBERLY
Judge: CARASSAS, JOHN |
|
January 28, 2016 | Docket Event |
COMPLAINT
Judge: CARASSAS, JOHN |
|
January 28, 2016 | Docket Event |
CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED
Judge: CARASSAS, JOHN |
|
January 28, 2016 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT LETTER RE: TENANCY WITHOUT A WRITTEN LEASE IS TERMINATED
Judge: CARASSAS, JOHN |
|
January 28, 2016 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED ISSUED ON 01282016 Party: LIVINGSTON, KIMBERLY
Judge: CARASSAS, JOHN |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.