Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Ocwen Loan Servicing Llc, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Jason Mankoff, against Any And All Unknown Parties Etc, Kelley, Orthneil D, Kelly, Loraine, represented by Karmika V Rubin, Esq, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with MINKOFF, THOMAS H presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMINKOFF, THOMAS H Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 28, 2016 |
CategoryReal Prop - Non-Homestead Res Foreclosure2 $50,001-$249,999 |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 28, 2017 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF NO DISBURSEMENT | |
June 28, 2017 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF TITLEVol./Book 19686, Page 1519, 1 pages | |
June 28, 2017 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF TITLE Vol./Book 19686, Page 1519, 1 pages
Judge: MINKOFF, THOMAS H |
|
June 15, 2017 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF SALEOCWEN LOAN SERVICING LLC | |
June 15, 2017 | Docket Event | JUDICIAL ONLINE SALE (10:00 AM) (Judicial Officer ONLINE SALE, JUDICIAL) REC VER | |
June 15, 2017 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF SALE OCWEN LOAN SERVICING LLC
Judge: MINKOFF, THOMAS H |
|
June 15, 2017 | Docket Event |
JUDICIAL ONLINE SALE (10:00 AM) (Judicial Officer ONLINE SALE, JUDICIAL) REC VER
Judge: MINKOFF, THOMAS H |
|
June 02, 2017 | Docket Event | PUBLISHER'S AFFIDAVIT NOTICE OF SALE | |
May 22, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SALE | |
May 17, 2017 | Docket Event | CLERK DENIAL OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATIONLOAN NUMBERS ARE NOT COVERED UNDER RULE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.