Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Wells Fargo Bank National Association, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Barry S Fishman, against Picot, Alberto, Picot, Kelly S, Regions Bank, represented by Starlett M Massey, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with CAMPBELL, PAMELA A.M. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCAMPBELL, PAMELA A.M. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2015 |
CategoryReal Prop - Homestead Res Foreclosure2 $50,001 - $249,999 |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 28, 2016 | Docket Event | CANCELED JUDICIAL ONLINE SALE (10:00 AM) (Judicial Officer ONLINE SALE, JUDICIAL) ORDER FROM COURTCANCELLED PER ORDER FROM JUDGE CAMPBELL | |
November 28, 2016 | Docket Event |
CANCELED JUDICIAL ONLINE SALE (10:00 AM) (Judicial Officer ONLINE SALE, JUDICIAL) ORDER FROM COURT CANCELLED PER ORDER FROM JUDGE CAMPBELL
Judge: CAMPBELL, PAMELA AM |
|
September 12, 2016 | Docket Event | RETURNED ORIGINAL LOAN DOCUMENTS | |
September 07, 2016 | Docket Event | ORDER OF DISMISSAL/ DISCHARGE LIS PENDENSVol./Book 19336, Page 131, 2 pages | |
September 07, 2016 | Docket Event | ORDER CANCELLING FORECLOSURE SALEOF 090216 / VACATE FINAL JUDGMENT / CLERK TO RETURN ORIGINAL LOAN DOCUMENTS AND | |
September 07, 2016 | Docket Event |
ORDER OF DISMISSAL / DISCHARGE LIS PENDENS Vol./Book 19336, Page 131, 2 pages
Judge: CAMPBELL, PAMELA AM |
|
September 07, 2016 | Docket Event |
ORDER CANCELLING FORECLOSURE SALE OF 090216 / VACATE FINAL JUDGMENT / CLERK TO RETURN ORIGINAL LOAN DOCUMENTS AND
Judge: CAMPBELL, PAMELA AM |
|
September 02, 2016 | Docket Event | CANCELED JUDICIAL ONLINE SALE (10:00 AM) (Judicial Officer ONLINE SALE, JUDICIAL) ORDER FROM COURTCANCELLED PER ORDER SIGNED BY JUDGE CAMPBELL / TO BE RESCHEDULED | |
September 02, 2016 | Docket Event |
CANCELED JUDICIAL ONLINE SALE (10:00 AM) (Judicial Officer ONLINE SALE, JUDICIAL) ORDER FROM COURT CANCELLED PER ORDER SIGNED BY JUDGE CAMPBELL / TO BE RESCHEDULED
Judge: CAMPBELL, PAMELA AM |
|
August 29, 2016 | Docket Event | PLTF-PET'S MOTIONTO CANCEL SALE / DISMISS ACTION / VACATE JUDGMENT ETC (AMENDED) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.