Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Wells Fargo Bank Na, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Marisa Zarzeski, against Any And All Unknown Parties Claiming Etc, Dort, Elizabeth S, Dort, G Prentice, Regions Bank, represented by Starlett M Massey, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with CAMPBELL, PAMELA A.M. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCAMPBELL, PAMELA A.M. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2015 |
CategoryReal Prop - Homestead Res Foreclosure3 $250,000 Or More |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 20, 2016 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF TITLEVol./Book 19347, Page 75, 1 pages | |
September 20, 2016 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF NO DISBURSEMENT | |
September 20, 2016 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF TITLE Vol./Book 19347, Page 75, 1 pages
Judge: CAMPBELL, PAMELA AM |
|
September 06, 2016 | Docket Event | JUDICIAL ONLINE SALE (10:00 AM) (Judicial Officer ONLINE SALE, JUDICIAL) REC VER | |
September 06, 2016 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF SALEWELLS FARGO BANK N A | |
September 06, 2016 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF SALE WELLS FARGO BANK N A
Judge: CAMPBELL, PAMELA AM |
|
September 06, 2016 | Docket Event |
JUDICIAL ONLINE SALE (10:00 AM) (Judicial Officer ONLINE SALE, JUDICIAL) REC VER
Judge: CAMPBELL, PAMELA AM |
|
August 19, 2016 | Docket Event | PUBLISHER'S AFFIDAVIT NOTICE OF SALE | |
August 04, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SALE | |
May 06, 2016 | Docket Event | UNIFORM FINAL JUDGMENT - BACKLOG PROJECT (SRS) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.