Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Bank Of New York Mellon Trust Company Na, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Jonathan Jacobson, Esq, against Unknown Spouse Of Luis Martinez, State Of Florida Department Of Revenue, Rijo Group Llc, Partners For Payment Relief De Ii Llc, Midatlantic Ira Llc  Fbo Jason Osser Bnf Ira, (total of 9) See All represented by Michael A Ziegler, Esq, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with MUSCARELLA, PATRICIA ANN presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMUSCARELLA, PATRICIA ANN Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 30, 2015 |
CategoryReal Prop - Non-Homestead Res Foreclosure2 $50,001-$249,999 |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 29, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS OF COUNSEL Doc # 19 | |
December 28, 2018 | Docket Event | SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY AS TO Doc # 1718-BK-11025-RCTParty: CARRERO, LUISA | |
December 28, 2018 | Docket Event | FORECLOSURE INACTIVE - BANKRUPTCY Doc # 18Party: CARRERO, LUISA | |
November 19, 2018 | Docket Event | LIST OF EXHIBITS Doc # 16 | |
November 19, 2018 | Docket Event | WITNESS LIST Doc # 15 | |
November 19, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVICE OF Doc # 14ATTACHED COPY OF ORDER SETTING FORECLOSURE NON-JURY TRIAL 012919 1:30 | |
November 06, 2018 | Docket Event | ORDER Doc # 13SETTING FORECLOSURE NON-JURY TRIAL 012919 1:30 | |
September 13, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE CAUSE IS AT ISSUE READY FOR TRIAL Doc # 11NON-JURY | |
September 13, 2018 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE WITH FORECLOSURE PROCEDURES Doc # 12 | |
August 22, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL Doc # 10 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.