Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Mitchell, Christopher Michael, filed a(n) General Property - Property case represented by Adam J Knight, Esq, against Burney, Marilyn, Butler, Dorothy, Cambell, George, Jr, Campbell, Coy, Campbell, Kenneth, (total of 16) See All represented by Kristopher Emil Fernandez, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with BOYER, BRUCE presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBOYER, BRUCE Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 30, 2015 |
CategoryReal Property Other1 - $0 - $50,000 |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 28, 2016 | Docket Event |
CORRESPONDENCE TO COURT RE PROPOSED FINAL JDMT
Judge: BOYER, BRUCE |
|
April 28, 2016 | Docket Event |
DEFAULT JUDGMENT (SRS DISPO)
Judge: BOYER, BRUCE |
|
April 28, 2016 | Docket Event |
FINAL JUDGMENT QUIETING TITLE Vol./Book 19173, Page 1378, 4 pages
Judge: BOYER, BRUCE |
|
April 27, 2016 | Docket Event |
ANSWER OF ALLEGATIONS Party: UNKNOWN HEIRS ETC AGAINST LEON CAMPBELL DECEASED
Judge: BOYER, BRUCE |
|
April 27, 2016 | Docket Event |
REPORT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM
Judge: BOYER, BRUCE |
|
April 27, 2016 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT A-ANSWER OF UNKNOWN HEIRS CLAIMING AGAINST LEON CAMPBELL
Judge: BOYER, BRUCE |
|
April 27, 2016 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT QUIETING TITLE ON PLEADINGS
Judge: BOYER, BRUCE |
|
March 31, 2016 | Docket Event |
DEFAULT ENTERED Party: CAMPBELL, ROSEMARY Party: CAMPBELL, TINA Party: MITCHELL, LAVORIA
Judge: BOYER, BRUCE |
|
March 28, 2016 | Docket Event |
(NON RECORDED) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF CLAIMS AGAINST STATE OF FLORIDA AND OF DROPPING STATE OF FLORIDA AS A PARTY-DEFENDANT
Judge: BOYER, BRUCE |
|
March 28, 2016 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR DEFAULT DEFAULT ENTERED 03/31/2016 Party: MITCHELL, CHRISTOPHER MICHAEL
Judge: BOYER, BRUCE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.