Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Laureigh, Amy, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Keith M Goan, against City Of St Petersburg, represented by Joseph P Patner, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with ALLAN, LINDA R. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeALLAN, LINDA R. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 30, 2015 |
CategoryAuto Negligence - Circuit |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 07, 2019 | Docket Event | NOT. OF SERV. OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT Doc # 9 | |
July 23, 2019 | Docket Event | CANCELED DISMISSAL DATE FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION (12:00 AM) (Judicial Officer NEWTON, CYNTHIA J) CURRENT ACTIVITY | |
July 17, 2019 | Docket Event | STATEMENT Doc # 8OF GOOD CAUSE | |
May 22, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE-LACK OF PROSECUTION MAILED TO ALL PARTIES Doc # 7 | |
May 29, 2018 | Docket Event | CANCELED DISMISSAL DATE FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION (12:00 AM) (Judicial Officer NEWTON, CYNTHIA J) CURRENT ACTIVITY | |
May 24, 2018 | Docket Event | DEF-RESP'S MOTION TO DISMISS Doc # 6 | |
April 26, 2018 | Docket Event | AMENDED COMPLAINT Doc # 5 | |
April 23, 2018 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTING Doc # 4MTN TO AMEND COMPLAINT | |
April 09, 2018 | Docket Event | OBJECTION Doc # 3TO MOTION TO AMEND COMPLAINT | |
April 06, 2018 | Docket Event | PLTF-PET'S MOTION TO AMEND Doc # 2COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.