Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Ditech Financial Llc, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Jonathan Meisels, against Any And All Unknown Parties Etc, Gegan, Susan E, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with NEWTON, CYNTHIA J presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeNEWTON, CYNTHIA J Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 29, 2015 |
CategoryReal Prop - Homestead Res Foreclosure1 $0 - $50,000 |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 20, 2016 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF TITLEVol./Book 19272, Page 1194, 1 pages | |
July 20, 2016 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENTS | |
July 07, 2016 | Docket Event | JUDICIAL ONLINE SALE (10:00 AM) (Judicial Officer ONLINE SALE, JUDICIAL) REC VER | |
July 07, 2016 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF SALEJAMES W DUNNE AND JUDITH L DUNNE HUSBAND AND WIFE | |
July 06, 2016 | Docket Event | ASSIGNMENT OF JUDGMENTAND BIDDING RIGHTSVol./Book 19257, Page 486, 2 pages | |
June 10, 2016 | Docket Event | PUBLISHER'S AFFIDAVIT NOTICE OF SALE | |
May 31, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SALE | |
May 23, 2016 | Docket Event | CLERK DENIAL OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATIONLOAN NUMBERS NOT COVERED | |
May 20, 2016 | Docket Event | UNIFORM FINAL JUDGMENT - BACKLOG PROJECT (SRS) | |
May 20, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILINGORIGINAL NOTE AND ORIGINAL MORTGAGE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.