Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Thompson, Michelle L, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by John F Mcguire, Esq, against Chaplow Hennessy, William R, represented by Thomas P Glenz, Esq, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with BOYER, BRUCE presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBOYER, BRUCE Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 29, 2015 |
CategoryAuto Negligence - Circuit |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 29, 2016 | Docket Event | ORDER OF DISMISSALW/ PREJUDICEVol./Book 19324, Page 1560, 1 pages | |
August 29, 2016 | Docket Event | CORRESPONDENCE TO COURT REPROPOSED ORDER | |
August 24, 2016 | Docket Event | JOINT STIPULATIONFOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE | |
August 24, 2016 | Docket Event | FINAL DISPOSITION FORM | |
August 24, 2016 | Docket Event | DISMISSED PURSUANT TO SETTLEMENT BEFORE HRG (SRS DISPO) | |
July 26, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTYW/ATTACHED SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM RECORDS W/O DEPOSITION TO BE ISSUED 7/26/2016 | |
July 21, 2016 | Docket Event | RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS | |
July 07, 2016 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION | |
July 07, 2016 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS | |
July 07, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.