Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Martinez, Reinel, Cunningham, Tasha, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Robert J Healy Jr, Esq, against Oliveras, Edwin A, represented by Kimberly J Lee, Esq, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with NEWTON, CYNTHIA J presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeNEWTON, CYNTHIA J Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 29, 2015 |
CategoryAuto Negligence - Circuit |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 22, 2016 | Docket Event | ORDER OF DISMISSALW/PREJUDICEVol./Book 19462, Page 566, 1 pages | |
December 20, 2016 | Docket Event | CASE DISMISSED - BEFORE HEARING (SRS DISPOSITION) | |
December 20, 2016 | Docket Event | JOINT STIPULATIONFOR DISMISSAL W/PREJUDICE | |
December 13, 2016 | Docket Event | NOT. OF SERV. OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT | |
October 20, 2016 | Docket Event | NOT. OF SERV. OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT | |
October 11, 2016 | Docket Event | RESPONSETO REQUEST FOR COPIES | |
October 07, 2016 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATEOF ATTENDANCE AND AUTHORITY | |
October 06, 2016 | Docket Event | RESPONSETO REQUEST FOR COPIES | |
September 20, 2016 | Docket Event | RESPONSETO REQUEST FOR COPIES | |
September 13, 2016 | Docket Event | RESPONSETO REQUEST FOR COPIES |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.