Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Lemieux, Sydney, Lemieux, William, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Robert J Healy, Jr, against Owners Insurance Company, represented by David A Finlay, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with NEWTON, CYNTHIA J presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeNEWTON, CYNTHIA J Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 29, 2015 |
CategoryAuto Negligence - Circuit |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 28, 2017 | Docket Event | ORDEROF FINAL DISMISSAL W/PREJUDICEVol./Book 19614, Page 612, 1 pages | |
April 28, 2017 | Docket Event |
ORDER OF FINAL DISMISSAL W/PREJUDICE Vol./Book 19614, Page 612, 1 pages
Judge: NEWTON, CYNTHIA J |
|
April 21, 2017 | Docket Event | JOINT STIPULATIONFOR FINAL DISMISSAL W/PREJUDICE | |
April 21, 2017 | Docket Event | FINAL DISPOSITION FORM | |
April 21, 2017 | Docket Event | DISMISSED-SETTLEMENT AFTER HRG (SRS DISPO) | |
April 21, 2017 | Docket Event |
JOINT STIPULATION FOR FINAL DISMISSAL W/PREJUDICE
Judge: NEWTON, CYNTHIA J |
|
November 21, 2016 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR COPIES | |
October 28, 2016 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR COPIES | |
October 20, 2016 | Docket Event | NOT. OF SERV. OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT | |
October 19, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY101916 (FOURTH) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.