Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
St Petersburg Police Department, filed a(n) Forfeiture - Criminal case represented by Sasha Lohn-Mcdermott, against Kettles, Tevin Jarquell, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with RONDOLINO, ANTHONY presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRONDOLINO, ANTHONY Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 28, 2015 |
CategoryForfeiture |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeForfeiture |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 16, 2016 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENTOF FORFEITUREVol./Book 19122, Page 1065, 2 pages | |
March 16, 2016 | Docket Event | FINAL DISPOSITION FORM | |
March 16, 2016 | Docket Event | DEFAULT JUDGMENT (SRS DISPO) | |
March 16, 2016 | Docket Event | CORRESPONDENCE TO COURT REPROPOSED JUDGMENT | |
March 15, 2016 | Docket Event | DEFAULT ENTEREDParty: KETTLES, TEVIN JARQUELL | |
March 11, 2016 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR DEFAULTDEFAULT ENTERED 3/15/16Party: ST PETERSBURG POLICE DEPARTMENT | |
March 11, 2016 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE | |
February 18, 2016 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVITOF SERVICE OF COMPLAINT FOR FORFEITURE, FINDING OF PROBABLE CAUSE | |
January 22, 2016 | Docket Event | PUBLISHER'S AFFIDAVIT30 DAYS | |
January 11, 2016 | Docket Event | FINDINGS OF PROBABLE CAUSE-ORDER TO ANSWER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.