Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Us Bank Trust Na, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Alicia R Whiting-Bozich, against Hunt, Paul E, Hunt, Tina, Pnc Bank National Association, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with MINKOFF, THOMAS H presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMINKOFF, THOMAS H Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 28, 2015 |
CategoryReal Prop - Homestead Res Foreclosure2 $50,001 - $249,999 |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 12, 2017 | Docket Event | RETURNED ORIGINAL LOAN DOCUMENTS | |
June 08, 2017 | Docket Event | ORDERFOR CLERK TO RELEASE ORIGINAL LOAN DOCUMENTS | |
June 08, 2017 | Docket Event | ATTORNEY COVER LETTER--- COURT RECEIVED | |
May 08, 2017 | Docket Event | PLTF-PET'S MOTION TO WITHDRAWORIGINAL DOCUMENTS FROM THE COURT FILE | |
May 08, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSALWITHOUT PREJUDICE, AND RELEASES THE NOTICE OF LIS PENDENSVol./Book 19623, Page 1696, 2 pages | |
May 08, 2017 | Docket Event | FINAL DISPOSITION FORM | |
May 08, 2017 | Docket Event | CASE DISMISSED - BEFORE HEARING (SRS DISPOSITION) | |
March 16, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICEOF CHANGE OF ATTY OF RECORD/DIRECTIONS TO CLERK TO UPDATE ATTY INFORMATION | |
March 13, 2017 | Docket Event | ATTACHMENTPAYMENT HISTORY | |
March 13, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILINGPAYMENT HISTORY |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.