Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Mainstream Partners Vi Llc, filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case represented by Donald H Crawford Ii, Esq, against Di Bartolo, Joe, Pie Topia Group, Llc, represented by Jay M Walker, Jay M Walker, Esq, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with SCHAFER, WALTER L, JR presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSCHAFER, WALTER L, JR Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 29, 2015 |
CategoryDelinquent Tenant - Circuit |
Last RefreshedOctober 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
DEF-RESP'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL
Date: August 24, 2016ORDER GRANTING AMENDED MTN WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL
Date: November 02, 2016WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED EXECUTED
Date: February 12, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 02, 2016 | Docket Event |
ORDER GRANTING AMENDED MTN WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL
Judge: SCHAFER, WALTER L, JR |
|
November 02, 2016 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTINGAMENDED MTN WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL | |
October 20, 2016 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING 110116 2:15
Judge: SCHAFER, WALTER L, JR |
|
October 20, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING110116 2:15 | |
October 19, 2016 | Docket Event |
DEF-RESP'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL (AMENDED)
Judge: SCHAFER, WALTER L, JR |
|
October 19, 2016 | Docket Event | CASE REOPENED | |
October 19, 2016 | Docket Event | DEF-RESP'S MOTION TO WITHDRAWAS COUNSEL (AMENDED) | |
August 24, 2016 | Docket Event |
DEF-RESP'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL
Judge: SCHAFER, WALTER L, JR |
|
August 24, 2016 | Docket Event | CASE REOPENED | |
August 24, 2016 | Docket Event | DEF-RESP'S MOTION TO WITHDRAWAS COUNSEL |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.