Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Capitti, Anthony M, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Howard Merricks, against Lamdee Group Llc A Florida Corporation, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with MUSCARELLA, PATRICIA ANN presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMUSCARELLA, PATRICIA ANN Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2014 |
CategoryNegligence - Premises Liability - Commercial |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 07, 2017 | Docket Event | CASE DISMISSED - AFTER HEARING (SRS DISPOSITION) | |
July 07, 2017 | Docket Event | MASTER ORDER OF DISMISSALLAMDEE GROUP LLCVol./Book 19699, Page 31, 3 pages | |
June 27, 2017 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL DATE FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION (12:00 AM) (Judicial Officer BOYER, BRUCE) | |
April 26, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE-LACK OF PROSECUTION MAILED TO ALL PARTIES | |
May 03, 2016 | Docket Event | CANCELED DISMISSAL DATE FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION (12:00 AM) (Judicial Officer BOYER, BRUCE) CURRENT ACTIVITY | |
April 08, 2016 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTINGMOTN TO REMOVE ATTY AND LAW FIRM FROM SERVICE LIST | |
April 08, 2016 | Docket Event | ATTORNEY COVER LETTERCOURT RCVD 040716 | |
April 06, 2016 | Docket Event | EXHIBIT040416 CORRESPONDENCE FROM MERRICKS LAW TO PLTF RE: DECLINE REPRESENTATION | |
April 06, 2016 | Docket Event | MOTIONTO REMOVE ATTY AND LAW FIRM FROM SERVICE LISTFiled by: MERRICKS, HOWARD | |
April 06, 2016 | Docket Event | EXHIBIT062515 ATTY CORRESPONDENCE RE: UNAWARE OF PRIOR LITIGATION IN MR CAPITTI'S CLAIM |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.