Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Gjyshi, Marlena, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Timothy Ingram, against Benincasa, Judy, represented by Reed H Johnson, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with DAY, JACK presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDAY, JACK Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2014 |
CategoryAuto Negligence - Circuit |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 09, 2016 | Docket Event | CASE DISMISSED - AFTER HEARING (SRS DISPOSITION) | |
August 09, 2016 | Docket Event | ORDER OF DISMISSALWITH PREJUDICEVol./Book 19298, Page 1743, 1 pages | |
July 26, 2016 | Docket Event | CORRESPONDENCE TO COURT REPROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED BY COURT 072516 | |
July 26, 2016 | Docket Event | ORDER OF DISMISSALAS TO JAMES MCGUIRE/MARY BETH MCGUIRE W/ PREJUDCEVol./Book 19283, Page 899, 1 pages | |
July 20, 2016 | Docket Event | JOINT STIPULATIONFOR DISMISSAL W/PREJUDICE AS TO JAMES MCGUIRE AND MARY BETH MCGUIRE ONLY | |
April 19, 2016 | Docket Event | AMENDEDWITNESS AND EXHIBIT LIST FOR TRIAL FOR THE TWO WEEK DOCKET BEGINNING JULY 11 2016 | |
April 11, 2016 | Docket Event | RESPONSETO SUPPLEMENTAL REQUEST TO PRODUCE | |
April 11, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVICE ANSWERS INTERROGATORIES(EXPERT) | |
April 11, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVICE OFOF ANSWERS TO SUPPLEMENTAL EXPERT INTERROGATORIES | |
April 11, 2016 | Docket Event | RESPONSETO SECOND SUPPLEMENTAL REQUEST TO PRODUCE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.