Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Jpmorgan Chase Bank National Association, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by John D Cusick, against Any And All Unknown Parties, Midland Funding Ncc 2 Corp, Miranda, Margarita, Synchrony Bank, The Unknown Heirs Or Beneficiaries  Estate Of Larry Thomas Deceased, (total of 6) See All represented by Stacie Vecchione, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with SCHAEFER, JOHN A presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSCHAEFER, JOHN A Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2014 |
CategoryReal Prop - Non-Homestead Res Foreclosure2 $50,001-$249,999 |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 25, 2016 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF NO DISBURSEMENT | |
April 25, 2016 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF TITLEVol./Book 19166, Page 2020, 1 pages | |
April 11, 2016 | Docket Event | JUDICIAL ONLINE SALE (10:00 AM) (Judicial Officer ONLINE SALE, JUDICIAL) REC VER | |
April 11, 2016 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF SALEJPMORGAN CHASE BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATIOON | |
March 11, 2016 | Docket Event | PUBLISHER'S AFFIDAVIT NOTICE OF SALE | |
February 09, 2016 | Docket Event | UNIFORM FINAL JUDGMENT - BACKLOG PROJECT (SRS) | |
February 09, 2016 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSUREVol./Book 19082, Page 924, 7 pages | |
February 09, 2016 | Docket Event | ATTORNEY COVER LETTER-RCVD BY COURT 012816 | |
December 04, 2015 | Docket Event | AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING020916 1:30 | |
October 06, 2015 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING12/08/15 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.