Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Etheridge, Pamela, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Joseph W Chambers, Esq, against Wilson, Ethan Nathaniel, Myers, Lila Schely  Individually And As Mother Of Ethan Nathaniel Wilson, A Minor, represented by David M Borrego, Esq, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with MINKOFF, THOMAS H presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMINKOFF, THOMAS H Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 30, 2014 |
CategoryAuto Negligence - Circuit |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 04, 2017 | Docket Event | (NON RECORDED) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSALW/PREJUDICE BY PLTF | |
January 04, 2017 | Docket Event | FINAL DISPOSITION FORM | |
January 04, 2017 | Docket Event | CASE DISMISSED - AFTER HEARING (SRS DISPOSITION) | |
December 08, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING010617 10:15 | |
December 01, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING010617 10:15 | |
November 29, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVICE EXPERT INTERROGATORIESAND TRIAL INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANTS | |
November 28, 2016 | Docket Event | WITNESS LISTAND EXHIBIT LIST (SUPPLEMENTAL) | |
November 21, 2016 | Docket Event | WITNESS LIST/ EXHIBIT LIST BY DEFTS | |
November 14, 2016 | Docket Event | MOTION SUBSTITUTING PARTYParty: ETHERIDGE, PAMELA | |
October 31, 2016 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR COPIES |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.