Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Wilmington Savings Fund Society Fsb, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Damian Waldman, against Cartwright, Jack, Las Palmas Townhomes Homeowners Association Inc, Mong, Carol, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with ST. ARNOLD, JACK R presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeST. ARNOLD, JACK R Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 29, 2014 |
CategoryReal Prop - Non-Homestead Res Foreclosure2 $50,001-$249,999 |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 25, 2016 | Docket Event | RETURNED FROM POST OFFICECERTIFICATE OF TITLE | |
April 12, 2016 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF TITLEVol./Book 19151, Page 1702, 1 pages | |
March 29, 2016 | Docket Event | JUDICIAL ONLINE SALE (10:00 AM) (Judicial Officer ONLINE SALE, JUDICIAL) REC VER | |
February 11, 2016 | Docket Event | CORRESPONDENCE FROM CLERK READDITONAL $1,000.00 FILING FEE/ RECD 030716 | |
February 09, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILINGORIGINAL NOTE AND MORTGAGE | |
February 03, 2016 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE WITH FORECLOSURE PROCEDURES | |
December 15, 2015 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING020916 1:30 | |
May 29, 2015 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ACTION EMAILED - BUSINESS OBSERVERAND ATTORNEYParty: LAS PALMAS TOWNHOMES HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC | |
May 15, 2015 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF ATTORNEY FEES | |
May 15, 2015 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILINGAFFIDAVIT AS TO ATTORNEYS FEES |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.