Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Von Schmidt Sr, Chet M, Sr, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by George R Brezina, Jr, against Pettry, Jessica F, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with ST. ARNOLD, JACK R presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeST. ARNOLD, JACK R Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 29, 2014 |
CategoryAuto Negligence - Circuit |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 22, 2015 | Docket Event | FINAL DISPOSITION FORM | |
September 29, 2015 | Docket Event | CASE DISMISSED - AFTER HEARING (SRS DISPOSITION) | |
September 29, 2015 | Docket Event | ORDER OF DISMISSALW/ PREJUDICEVol./Book 18939, Page 143, 1 pages | |
September 29, 2015 | Docket Event | STIPULATIONFOR FINAL DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE | |
September 29, 2015 | Docket Event | CORRESPONDENCE TO COURT REPROPOSED ORDER RECD BY COURT 09/28/15 | |
August 12, 2015 | Docket Event | SUBPOENARETD SERVED | |
August 05, 2015 | Docket Event | SUBPOENADUCES TECUM- SERVED | |
July 21, 2015 | Docket Event | NOT. OF SERV. OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT | |
July 15, 2015 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY7-15-2015 | |
July 01, 2015 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY070115 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.