Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Bank Of America N A, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Joshua D Moore, against Thibodeau, Peter, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with SCHAFER, WALTER L, JR presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSCHAFER, WALTER L, JR Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 29, 2014 |
CategoryContracts And Indebtedness - Circuit |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 05, 2016 | Docket Event | (NON RECORDED) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSALWITHOUT PREJUDICE | |
October 05, 2016 | Docket Event | CASE DISMISSED - BEFORE HEARING (SRS DISPOSITION) | |
April 05, 2016 | Docket Event | CANCELED DISMISSAL DATE FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION (12:00 AM) (Judicial Officer SCHAFER, WALTER L, JR) CURRENT ACTIVITY | |
February 24, 2016 | Docket Event | ORDERON PLTFS STATEMENT OF GOOD CAUSE AND TO CANCEL HEARING | |
February 24, 2016 | Docket Event | CORRESPONDENCE TO COURT REPROPOSED ORDERRCVD BY COURT 022316 | |
February 18, 2016 | Docket Event | STATEMENTOF GOOD CAUSE WHY CASE SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED | |
February 03, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE-LACK OF PROSECUTION MAILED TO ALL PARTIES | |
February 23, 2015 | Docket Event | DEFAULT NOT ENTEREDNOT ENTERED BY CLERK/DEFENDANT FILED AN ANSWER ON 2/19/2015//NO RETURN OF SERVICE | |
February 19, 2015 | Docket Event | SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY AS TOPETER THIBODEAU / 8:15-BK-01606 | |
February 18, 2015 | Docket Event | PLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.