Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Jeremy Apisdorf, against Eastwood Shores Property Owners Association Inc, Eastwood Shores Townhomes Association Inc, Timmons, Francisco, Timmons, Linda, represented by Brandon K Mullis, Esq, Shawn G Brown, Esq, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with SCHAEFER, JOHN A presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSCHAEFER, JOHN A Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 26, 2014 |
CategoryReal Prop - Non-Homestead Res Foreclosure2 $50,001-$249,999 |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 02, 2016 | Docket Event | COPY CERT OF TITLE & CERT OF NO DISBURSEMENT RETD BY POParty: TIMMONS, FRANCISCO | |
November 29, 2016 | Docket Event | COPY CERT OF TITLE & CERT OF NO DISBURSEMENT RETD BY POParty: TIMMONS, LINDA | |
November 21, 2016 | Docket Event | COPY CERTIFICATE OF SALE RETURNED BY POST OFFICEUNKNOWN SPOUSE OF LINDA TIMMONS | |
November 14, 2016 | Docket Event | COPY CERTIFICATE OF SALE RETURNED BY POST OFFICEW/ PUBLISHERS AFFIDAVIT NOTICE OF SALE | |
November 09, 2016 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF NO DISBURSEMENT | |
November 09, 2016 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF TITLEVol./Book 19408, Page 2554, 1 pages | |
October 28, 2016 | Docket Event | JUDICIAL ONLINE SALE (10:00 AM) (Judicial Officer ONLINE SALE, JUDICIAL) REC VER | |
October 28, 2016 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF SALEDEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY | |
October 26, 2016 | Docket Event | PUBLISHER'S AFFIDAVIT NOTICE OF SALE | |
October 26, 2016 | Docket Event | ORDER DENYINGPLTF MTN TO CANCEL 102816 SALE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.