Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Pastor, Laura, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Javier M Vazquez, against Lincoln Shores Apartments Investors Llc, represented by Lisa Connor Cicero, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with DAY, JACK presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDAY, JACK Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 10, 2014 |
CategoryNegligence - Premises Liability - Commercial |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 06, 2015 | Docket Event | FINAL DISPOSITION FORM | |
October 24, 2014 | Docket Event | (NON RECORDED) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL W/PREJUDICE | |
October 24, 2014 | Docket Event | (NON RECORDED) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSALW/PREJUDICE | |
October 24, 2014 | Docket Event | CASE DISMISSED - BEFORE HEARING (SRS DISPOSITION) | |
October 24, 2014 | Docket Event | AMENDED COMPLAINT | |
October 13, 2014 | Docket Event | RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS | |
October 10, 2014 | Docket Event | ANSWER-AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES OF LINCOLN SHORES APARTMENTS INVESTORS LLC | |
October 10, 2014 | Docket Event | DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL | |
October 10, 2014 | Docket Event | ANSWER-AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES OFLINCOLN SHORES APARTMENTS INVESTORS LLC | |
March 10, 2014 | Docket Event | SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED ISSUED ON 03-12-2014 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.