Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Bank Of America Na, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Laura L Walker, against Any And All Unknown Parties, Boyhassoun, Lilali, Capital One Bank Usa Na, Jonathan C Yoder, Kevin J Doan, (total of 12) See All represented by Leslie S White, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with CAMPBELL, PAMELA A.M. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCAMPBELL, PAMELA A.M. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2013 |
CategoryReal Prop - Homestead Res Foreclosure3 $250,000 Or More |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 08, 2015 | Docket Event | RETURNED FROM POST OFFICECERTIFICATE OF TITLE | |
March 20, 2015 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF TITLEVol./Book 18716, Page 2615, 2 pages | |
March 20, 2015 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENTS | |
March 09, 2015 | Docket Event | JUDICIAL ONLINE SALE (10:00 AM) (Judicial Officer ONLINE SALE, JUDICIAL) REC VER | |
March 09, 2015 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF SALECR PROPERTY ACCQUISITIONS INC/MPM REAL PROPERTY INVESTMENTS INC | |
February 15, 2015 | Docket Event | COPYPUBLISHER AFFD NOTICE OF SALE | |
February 13, 2015 | Docket Event | PUBLISHER'S AFFIDAVIT NOTICE OF SALE | |
February 12, 2015 | Docket Event | ASSIGNMENTOF JUDGMENT | |
January 29, 2015 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SALE | |
January 13, 2015 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSUREVol./Book 18650, Page 185, 8 pages |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.