Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Terranova Land And Properties Corp, filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case against Ward, Tiffany, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with FULLERTON, WALTER presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFULLERTON, WALTER Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2013 |
CategoryDelinquent Tenant - County |
Last RefreshedJuly 18, 2022 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
FINAL JUDGMENT- COUNT 1 POSSESSION IN FAVOR OF PLAINTIFF Vol./Book 18285, Page 1395, 1 pages
Date: January 21, 2014FINAL DISPOSITION FORM
Date: January 21, 2014PLTF-PET'S MOTION DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT- RESIDENTIAL EVICTION PRO SE
Date: January 15, 2014Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 03, 2014 | Docket Event |
WRIT OF POSSESSION RETD EXECUTED
Judge: FULLERTON, WALTER |
|
January 28, 2014 | Docket Event |
WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED TO SHERIFF
Judge: FULLERTON, WALTER |
|
January 28, 2014 | Docket Event |
WRIT OF POSSESSION RECEIVED WITH CHECK
Judge: FULLERTON, WALTER |
|
January 21, 2014 | Docket Event |
FINAL JUDGMENT- COUNT 1 POSSESSION IN FAVOR OF PLAINTIFF Vol./Book 18285, Page 1395, 1 pages
Judge: FULLERTON, WALTER |
|
January 21, 2014 | Docket Event |
FINAL DISPOSITION FORM
Judge: FULLERTON, WALTER |
|
January 21, 2014 | Docket Event |
DEFAULT ENTERED BY COURT N/K/A TIFFANY WARD Party: WARD, TIFFANY
Judge: FULLERTON, WALTER |
|
January 21, 2014 | Docket Event |
DEFAULT JUDGMENT (SRS DISPO)
Judge: FULLERTON, WALTER |
|
January 16, 2014 | Docket Event |
UNSIGNED ORDER SENT TO JUDGE FJT ENV
Judge: FULLERTON, WALTER |
|
January 15, 2014 | Docket Event |
PLTF-PET'S MOTION DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT- RESIDENTIAL EVICTION PRO SE
Judge: FULLERTON, WALTER |
|
January 15, 2014 | Docket Event |
NOTICE BY PROPERTY MANAGER TO TENANT OF TAKING OVER MANAGEMENT
Judge: FULLERTON, WALTER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.